+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 574
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Children and Senior Advocacy
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 342
- Orr Amendment Offered
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 343
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 344
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 12, 2016: Roll 574
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 3
March 10, 2016: Roll 342
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
March 10, 2016: Roll 343
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
March 10, 2016: Roll 344
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor