+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 538
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 537
- Orr Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2017: Roll 537
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
April 11, 2017: Roll 538
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor