+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 327
- Third Reading Passed
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 193
- Third Reading Passed
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism and Marketing
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 5, 2016: Roll 525
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2016: Roll 526
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 8
April 5, 2016: Roll 527
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
March 22, 2016: Roll 327
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 9
February 23, 2016: Roll 193
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor