+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-187)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-187.
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 677
- Motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 676
- Hill Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 431
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 430
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (4)
May 14, 2019: Roll 676
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 73
- Present/NV: 13
May 14, 2019: Roll 677
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 6
April 30, 2019: Roll 430
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
April 30, 2019: Roll 431
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor