+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2018-355)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
- Signature Requested
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 808
- Concurrence Requested
- Assigned Act No. 2018-355.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 732
- Third Reading Passed
- Ways and Means General Fund first Substitute Offered
- Rich Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 733
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 734
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 509
- Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 508
- Dial first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Votes (6)
March 15, 2018: Roll 808
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
March 13, 2018: Roll 732
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 13
March 13, 2018: Roll 733
- Yeas: 84
- Present/NV: 18
March 13, 2018: Roll 734
- Yeas: 87
- Present/NV: 15
February 27, 2018: Roll 508
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
February 27, 2018: Roll 509
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor