+ − Effective Date
- July 01, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-417.
- Enrolled
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Voice Vote 900
- Third Reading Passed
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 498
- Third Reading Passed
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 5, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Voice Vote 900 Vote
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 3
March 9, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 498 Vote
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor