+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 11:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013
- Assigned Act No. 2013-308.
- Enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1248
- Third Reading Passed
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 486
- Third Reading Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1248
- Yeas: 100
February 26, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor