+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-218)
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-218.
- Enrolled
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 654
- Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Montgomery County Legislation
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 147
- Third Reading Passed
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2019: Roll 654
- Yeas: 20
- Present/NV: 84
April 4, 2019: Roll 147
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor