+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Further Consideration
- Johnson (K) motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Johnson (K) motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Ways and Means General Fund first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Carried Over
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 24
- Third Reading Passed
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
August 5, 2015: Roll 24
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor