+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-119)
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-119.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Local Application Resolution adopted Roll Call 526
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 525
- Third Reading Passed
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Montgomery County Legislation
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Barfoot motion to adopt Local Application Resolution adopted Roll Call 464
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 463
- Third Reading Passed
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2021: Roll 525
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 39
March 30, 2021: Roll 526
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 55
March 9, 2021: Roll 463
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 4
March 9, 2021: Roll 464
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor