+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2018-181)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-181.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 519
- Third Reading Passed
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 272
- Third Reading Passed
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2018: Roll 519
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 6
February 1, 2018: Roll 272
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor