+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 786
- Third Reading Passed
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 295
- Third Reading Passed
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
+ − Votes (3)
May 4, 2017: Roll 786
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 3
April 13, 2017: Roll 607
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
March 9, 2017: Roll 295
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor