+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-499)
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1219
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-499.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1217
- Ledbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1218
- Third Reading Passed
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
- Singleton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1460
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 601
- Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 600
- Smitherman Amendment Offered
- Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 599
- Banking and Insurance Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
May 17, 2021: Roll 1217
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 4
May 17, 2021: Roll 1218
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 7
May 17, 2021: Roll 1219
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
May 17, 2021: Roll 1460
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 3
March 16, 2021: Roll 599
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 4
March 16, 2021: Roll 600
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 4
March 16, 2021: Roll 601
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor