+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2013-66.
- Signature Requested
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 197
- Third Reading Passed
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 154
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 153
- Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 197
- Yeas: 98
February 26, 2013: Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 153
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
February 21, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1