+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Signature Requested
- Assigned Act No. 2013-252.
- Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on May 9, 2013
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1128
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Bussman first Substitute Offered
- Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 478
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 479
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 7, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1128
- Yeas: 96
April 18, 2013: Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 478
- Yeas: 27
February 26, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor