+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Judiciary
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Dunn motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 553
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 554
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 26, 2014: Dunn motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 553
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
February 26, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 554
- Yeas: 27
February 12, 2014: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor