+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Assigned Act No. 2013-312.
- Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1286
- MOTION TO SUSPEND RULES ADOPTED
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 362
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 363
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Business and Labor
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1286
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 3
April 10, 2013: Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 362
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor