+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Wilcox filed a Conflict of Interest Declaration
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 888
- Ledbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 887
- Third Reading Passed
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reed motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Passed
- Transportation and Energy Amendment Offered
- Engrossed
- Reed first Substitute Offered
- Reed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 261
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 262
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy
+ − Votes (4)
May 16, 2017: Roll 887
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 7
May 16, 2017: Roll 888
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 7
March 9, 2017: Roll 261
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 13
March 9, 2017: Roll 262
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor