+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-381)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-381.
- Enrolled
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1023
- Third Reading Passed
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 162
- Third Reading Passed
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2021: Roll 1023
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 13
February 11, 2021: Roll 162
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor