+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-306.
- Forwarded to Governor on May 28, 2015 at 1:35 p.m. on may 28, 2015
- Enrolled
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Signature Requested
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1277
- Concurrence Requested
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1144
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1143
- Wood Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1142
- Public Safety and Homeland Security first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 255
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 254
- Sanford Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 248
- Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
May 28, 2015: Roll 1142
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 10
May 28, 2015: Roll 1143
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 7
May 28, 2015: Roll 1144
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 8
May 28, 2015: Roll 1277
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 5
March 31, 2015: Roll 248
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
March 31, 2015: Roll 254
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
March 31, 2015: Roll 255
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor