+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
- Signature Requested
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1185
- Enrolled
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
- Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment
- Judiciary first Amendment Offered
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Transportation and Energy first Substitute Offered
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 294
- Orr Amendment Offered
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 295
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 296
- Engrossed
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
February 25, 2021: Roll 294
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2021: Roll 295
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2021: Roll 296
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor