+ − Effective Date
- March 10, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-131.
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 429
- Third Reading Passed
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 299
- Third Reading Passed
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Vote
March 2, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 429 Vote
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor