+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-204)
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-204.
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 672
- Garrett motion to Table adopted Roll Call 671
- Clarke Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 353
- Third Reading Passed
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
+ − Votes (3)
May 14, 2019: Roll 671
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 5
May 14, 2019: Roll 672
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 4
April 23, 2019: Roll 353
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor