+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2020-174)
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor at 8:06 p.m. May 7,2020
- Assigned Act No. 2020-174.
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 536
- Third Reading Passed
On May 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
On May 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 431
- Chambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 430
- Chambliss Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On May 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (3)
May 7, 2020: Roll 536
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 66
May 5, 2020: Roll 430
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 11
May 5, 2020: Roll 431
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor