+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On May 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enacted
On May 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ready to Enroll
- Enrolled
- Delivered to Governor
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1085
- Signature Requested
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
On April 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Judiciary 1st Amendment Offered
- Givhan motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 608
On April 18, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on State Government
On April 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 609
- Engrossed
On April 18, 2024 in the House:
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Judiciary 1st Amendment
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
On March 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 2, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 1
May 2, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1085 Vote
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
April 18, 2024: Givhan motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 608 Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
April 18, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 609 Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor