+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Signature Requested
- Forwarded to Governor at 12:30 p.m. on April 4, 2013
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
- Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 298
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2013-80.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Holmes 1st Amendment Offered
- McCutcheon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 221
- Holmes 2nd Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 222
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 223
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Bussman Amendment Offered
- Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 156
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 157
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 4, 2013: Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 298
- Yeas: 31
March 20, 2013: McCutcheon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 221
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 28
March 20, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 222
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 4
March 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 223
- Yeas: 100
February 26, 2013: Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 156
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor