+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-250)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-250.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 615
- Third Reading Passed
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 199
- Third Reading Passed
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2018: Roll 615
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 6
January 30, 2018: Roll 199
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor