+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-331)
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-331.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 984
- Third Reading Passed
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 676
- Third Reading Passed
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Taxation Education as Favorable
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2021: Roll 984
- Yeas: 103
March 18, 2021: Roll 676
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor