+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-391)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
- Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1186
- Assigned Act No. 2021-391.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 978
- Poole Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 979
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 980
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Finance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered
- Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Orr first Substitute Offered
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 685
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 686
- Engrossed
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Taxation Education as Favorable with 1 substitute
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
April 29, 2021: Roll 1186
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
April 27, 2021: Roll 978
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 4
April 27, 2021: Roll 979
- Yeas: 103
April 27, 2021: Roll 980
- Yeas: 103
March 18, 2021: Roll 685
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
March 18, 2021: Roll 686
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor