+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On September 18, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Financial Services
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 346
- Third Reading Passed
- Brewbaker motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
+ − Vote
February 8, 2018: Roll 346
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor