+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On December 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-342)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
- Signature Requested
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
- Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1187
- Assigned Act No. 2021-342.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 987
- Poole Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 988
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 989
- Daniels intended to vote "Yea"
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Finance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 689
- Orr Amendment Offered
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 690
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 691
- Engrossed
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Taxation Education as Favorable with 1 substitute
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
April 29, 2021: Roll 1187
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
April 27, 2021: Roll 987
- Yeas: 103
April 27, 2021: Roll 988
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2021: Roll 989
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 18, 2021: Roll 691
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 5
March 18, 2021: Roll 689
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 5
March 18, 2021: Roll 690
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor