+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-330)
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-330.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 970
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Smitherman motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 683
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Taxation Education as Favorable
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2021: Roll 970
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 18, 2021: Roll 683
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor