+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 875
- Engrossed
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 671
- Marsh Amendment Offered
- Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 672
- Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2017: Roll 875
- Yeas: 20
- Present/NV: 15
April 20, 2017: Roll 671
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
April 20, 2017: Roll 672
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor