+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2014-300.
- Signature Requested
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1024
- Third Reading Passed
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 284
- Third Reading Passed
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
+ − Vote
April 1, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1024
- Yeas: 102
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor