+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-352)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-352.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chambliss motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 884
- Concurrence Requested
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 730
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 729
- Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 514
- Chambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 513
- Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pittman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Votes (5)
March 15, 2018: Roll 884
- Yeas: 20
- Present/NV: 14
March 13, 2018: Roll 729
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 4
March 13, 2018: Roll 730
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2018: Roll 513
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
February 27, 2018: Roll 514
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor