+ − Effective Date
- April 14, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Assigned Act No. 2022-371.
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 937
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 166
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 6, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 937 Vote
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
February 9, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 166 Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor