+ − Effective Date
- May 08, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-289.
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Coleman intended to vote "Nay"
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 957
- Kitchens motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 956
- Third Reading Passed
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 383
- Waggoner motion to Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 382
- Shelnutt motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 381
- Third Reading Passed
- Healthcare Amendment Offered
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2022: Kitchens motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 956 Vote
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 1
April 7, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 957 Vote
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor