+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Pending third reading on day 11 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 126
- Third Reading Passed
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Vote
February 23, 2017: Roll 126
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor