+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-283.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 952
- Third Reading Passed
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 912
- Third Reading Passed
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
+ − Votes (2)
May 21, 2015: Roll 952
- Yeas: 102
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 12, 2015: Roll 912
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor