+ − Effective Date
- March 08, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Assigned Act No. 2022-106.
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 351
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 151
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 152
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 9, 2022: Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 151 Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
February 9, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 152 Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor