+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-317)
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-317.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 915
- Third Reading Passed
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 213
- Third Reading Passed
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare
+ − Votes (2)
April 20, 2021: Roll 915
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 6
February 11, 2021: Roll 213
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor