+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 451
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 450
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 312
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 311
- Orr Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Taxation General Fund as Favorable
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2020: Roll 311
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
March 5, 2020: Roll 312
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor