+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-507.
On August 7, 2015 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On August 7, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 32
- Third Reading Passed
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 21
- McClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 20
- Local Legislation Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On August 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
August 7, 2015: Roll 32
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 89
August 5, 2015: Roll 20
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 16
August 5, 2015: Roll 21
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor