+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 790
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 789
- Orr Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 788
- Transportation and Energy first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 5, 2015: Roll 788
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
May 5, 2015: Roll 789
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
May 5, 2015: Roll 790
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor