+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On May 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enacted
On May 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ready to Enroll
- Enrolled
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1028
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
On April 4, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Fiscal Responsibility
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 298
On March 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On February 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Note
+ − Votes (4)
May 2, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
May 2, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1028 Vote
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 2
April 4, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 4, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 298 Vote
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor