+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-264)
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-264.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 725
- Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 439
- Third Reading Passed
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2018: Roll 725
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 6
February 20, 2018: Roll 439
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor