+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-263)
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-263.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Givan intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 723
- Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 437
- Third Reading Passed
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2018: Roll 723
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 7
February 20, 2018: Roll 437
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor