+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-262)
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-262.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 716
- Third Reading Passed
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Pittman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Finance and Taxation General Fund zeroeth Substitute Offered
- Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 589
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 590
- Engrossed
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Votes (3)
March 13, 2018: Roll 716
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 21
March 1, 2018: Roll 589
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
March 1, 2018: Roll 590
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor