+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 899
- McCampbell motion to Table adopted Roll Call 898
- State Government Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 374
- Third Reading Passed
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 4, 2016: Roll 898
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 13
May 4, 2016: Roll 899
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
March 15, 2016: Roll 374
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor