+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-456.
- Delivered to Governor at 2:22 p.m. on May 6, 2021.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Pending third reading on day 15 Favorable from Education Policy
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Figures Amendment Offered
- Figures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 279
- Figures Amendment Offered
- Figures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 280
- Singleton Amendment Offered
- Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 281
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 282
- Engrossed
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2021: Roll 279
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2021: Roll 280
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2021: Roll 281
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2021: Roll 282
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor